MA H2885 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4177
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Telecommunications and Cable and the Department of Public Utilities to regulate the use of double utility poles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to double utility poles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4177 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4177 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2885 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2885.pdf |