MA H2873 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to create a master teacher corps program. Education.
Title
Relative to improving teacher preparation and certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1415 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1368 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1415 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1368 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2873 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2873.pdf |