MA H2872 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the establishment of a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2798 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2809 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback