MA H2857 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hunt of Boston, a petition of Daniel J. Hunt that certain municipalities be authorized to designate an enterprise fund under the control of the school committee for pupil transportation services. Education.
Title
Regarding school pupil transportation services
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4132 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4132 (Replaced by) 2018-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4840
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4132 (Replaced by) 2018-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4840
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2857 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2857.pdf |