MA H2847 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of contractors for repairing or performing work on public utility infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To ensure safety and transparency in pipeline repair
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1605 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5086
H1682 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S211 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1079 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1115 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S88 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied H3547
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H1682 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S211 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1079 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1115 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S88 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied H3547
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2847 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2847.pdf |