MA H2838 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land containing the Salem District Court Building to the Salem Redevelopment Authority. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Directing the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the Salem Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-07-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-10 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-06-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 29, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2838 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2838.pdf |