MA H2822 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4162

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to expanding property tax exemptions for veterans. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to expanding property tax exemptions for veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-06HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4162
2023-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4162 (Replaced by) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2688 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4616 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4671 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Committee of conference appointed (Velis-Rush-Fattman), in concurrence
H4661 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - Published as amended, see H4671
H4869 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback