MA H2795 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a registration system for lobbyists advocating independently for social and environmental justice. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Enabling lobbying by the public on behalf of social and environmental justice
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2781 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2795 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2795.pdf |