MA H2763 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-13 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-13 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a designated parking space for veterans at city and town halls. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Providing for designated parking for veterans at city and town halls
Sponsors
Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 277 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-11-08 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 277) |
2017-11-08 | House | Read third |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/17 from 2:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 & B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2763 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2763.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj11082017_RollCalls.pdf |