MA H2735 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fundraisers for injured first responders. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to fundraisers for injured first responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2016 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1653 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1339 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S793 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H1569 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1653 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1339 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S793 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H1569 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2735.pdf |