MA H2722 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the taxation of graduate student loan debt. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce graduate student loan debt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2787 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Placed on file
H4575 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback