MA H2705 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that certain legislation enacted by the General Court and approved by the Governor contain fiscal notes or local mandate statements. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Relative to local impacts of enacted legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H2103 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2705.pdf |