MA H2670 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide an income tax exemption for families caring for their elderly relatives at home. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide an income tax exemption for families caring for their elderly relatives at home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2012 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2670 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14473&generalCourtId=1 |