MA H2654 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4526
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to guranteeing consumer ownership of, privacy of, and access to motor vehicle computer data. Transportation.
Title
Guranteeing consumer ownership of, privacy of, and access to motor vehicle computer data
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4526 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-07-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, May 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4526 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2654 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13638&generalCourtId=1 |