MA H2650 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4437
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an income tax deduction for municipal and school fees. Revenue.
Title
To create an income tax deduction for municipal and school fees
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Thomas Conroy [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4437 |
2013-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4437 (Replaced by) 2014-11-13 - Reported, in part, by H3537
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2650 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2650.pdf |