MA H2645 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to continue tax basis rules for property acquired from decedents. Revenue.
Title
To continue tax basis rules for property acquired from decedents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1525 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S795 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H1557 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S795 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H1557 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2645 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2645.pdf |