MA H2636 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts estate tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts estate tax
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2446 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2636.pdf |