MA H2446 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the estate tax code of the Commonwealth. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Massachusetts estate tax code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2595 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2601 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H2560 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Senate concurred
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H4244 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback