MA H2634 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5080

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a property tax exemption for members of the National Guard. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a property tax exemption for members of the National Guard

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5080
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3195 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H2208 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2428 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback