MA H2570 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4518

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the granting of certain creditable service to Robin Blatt, a member of the state employees' retirement system. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting creditable service to Robin Blatt, a member of the state employees' retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4518
2023-04-04JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4494 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback