MA H2543 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the assessment of local taxes. Revenue.
Title
Relative to assessing administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2597 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1866 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1866 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2543 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2543.pdf |