MA H2543 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to industrial zoned small business property tax exemptions. Revenue.
Title
Relative to industrial zoned small business property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4212 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4212 (Replaced by) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
H203 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1845 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
H203 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1845 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2543 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2543.pdf |