MA H2540 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to low-income housing tax credits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to low-income housing tax credits
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2758 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2758 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2540 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2540.pdf |