MA H2517 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement of certain employees of water departments, sewer departments, wastewater facilities and the Water Resources Authority. Public Service.
Title
Relative to providing fairness and equity in the retirement benefits of employees of the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority, sewer departments, sewer districts, water and sewer departments and districts, and wastewater facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2517.pdf |