MA H2506 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care facilities to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring health care facilities to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H2322 (Similar To) 2021-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H2322 (Similar To) 2021-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2506 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2506.pdf |