MA H2474 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to income tax exemptions for certain survivors of acts of terrorism. Revenue.
Title
Relative to an income tax exemption for survivors of terrorism who have lost one or more limbs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2467 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2467 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2474 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2474.pdf |