MA H2450 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the registration of podiatrists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the definition of podiatry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | House concurred |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1041 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2110
H1981 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1981 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2450.pdf |