MA H245 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to charter schools. Education.
Title
Relative to charter schools
Sponsors
Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4716 |
2017-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4716 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4809 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2018
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4716 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4809 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H245 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H245.pdf |