MA H2448 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to excluding student loan forgiveness from taxable income for permanently and totally disabled veterans. Revenue.
Title
Excluding student loan forgiveness from taxable income for permanently and totally disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2389 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2626 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2389 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2626 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2448 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2448.pdf |