MA H2425 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the payment of fees to challenge or appeal a finding of a local police department by persons holding handicapped licenses or placards. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to handicap automobile licenses or placards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H14 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H14 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2425 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2425.pdf |