MA H2423 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing advanced life support to police dogs injured in the line of duty. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to providing advanced life support to police dogs injured in the line of duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2424 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2423 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2423.pdf |