MA H2420 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to restoring the harbors and inland waters maintenance fund. Revenue.
Title
Restoring the harbors and inland waters maintenance fund
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1670 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1856 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H847 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1670 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1856 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H847 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2420.pdf |