MA H2419 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5128

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 89-18)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the expiration date of the film tax credit. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To remove the film tax credit expiration date

Sponsors

Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. David Nangle [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]
Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5128
2019-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback