MA H2629 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain tax exemptions for motion picture productions. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the film tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2594 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2389 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1792 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2594 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2389 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1792 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2629 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2629.pdf |