MA H2418 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1573
Note: Replaces legislation S1580
Note: Replaces legislation S1580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local and state law enforcement involvement in federal immigration enforcement. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-06-28 | House | Accompanied by S1573, S1579 and S1580 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1544 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1573 (Replaces) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1580 (Replaces) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1573 (Replaces) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1580 (Replaces) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2418 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2418.pdf |