MA H2404 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the postpartum treatment of women in correctional facilities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the postpartum treatment of women in correctional facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Priscila Sousa [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2404 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2404.pdf |