MA H238 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a remediation program for dentists dealing with illness, substance abuse or mental health issues. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Establishing a dentist diversion program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H203 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S567 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S594 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1210 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S567 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S594 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1210 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H238 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H238.pdf |