MA H2356 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to add law enforcement councils to the definition of employer under the tort claim law. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To add law enforcement councils to the Massachusetts TORT Claims Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-03-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2018-02-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-08-31JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback