MA H2344 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to police transparency. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for greater police transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-12-04JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H4028 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback