MA H2316 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to criminal forfeiture. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal forfeiture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H2546 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H164 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1932 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H351 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2241 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H52 (Similar To) 2017-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H54 (Similar To) 2017-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H37 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H39 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback