MA H2311 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to credible service for school nurses. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to credible service for school nurses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2268 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2309 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2370 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H52 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2160 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2165 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2351 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1581 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2159 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2257 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback