MA H2299 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Accompanied S1446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Accompanied S1446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to membership of the Commission on Falls Prevention. Public Health.
Title
Further regulating the commission on falls prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Accompanied S1446 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1446 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 343 of the Acts of 2022
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2299.pdf |