MA H2279 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2615
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Dykema of Holliston, a petition of Carolyn C. Dykema and others that the Department of Public Health establish a voluntary certification training program for care of certain patients with intellectual and developmental disabilities including autism. Public Health.
Title
Improving health care for patients with intellectual and developmental disabilities including autism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2615 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2615 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2279 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2279.pdf |