MA H2250 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H44

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the investment of retirement funds in woman-owned businesses and businesses owned by underrepresented people of color. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring investment equality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied H44
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1673 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S85 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S687 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H329 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H44 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback