MA H2243 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating a rebuttable presumption of job relatedness for certain public safety personnel suffering from disabling conditions caused by exposure to infectious diseases. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability or death caused by contagious diseases, presumption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-30 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2320 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2243.pdf |