MA H224 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to large family child care homes. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to large family child care homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H1590 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4460
H2876 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2848 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1946 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1960 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S475 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see S3152
S339 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S317 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H1590 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4460
H2876 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2848 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1946 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1960 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S475 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see S3152
S339 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S317 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H224 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H224.pdf |