MA H223 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4908
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the family medical history of adopted children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To enact Patricia and Francesca's Law relative to the family medical history of adopted children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4908 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1652 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H223 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H223.pdf |