MA H223 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dispute resolution processes within the Bureau of Special Education Appeals. Education.
Title
To provide equal access to the Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H223 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H223.pdf |