MA H22 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Massachusetts Teachers' Retirement Board (House, No. 18) as relates to the interest charged on refund buybacks. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the interest charged on refund buybacks
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2021 from 09:30 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2594 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H19 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H20 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H21 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H23 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H24 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1790 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H19 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H20 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H21 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H23 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H24 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1790 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H22 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H22.pdf |