MA H219 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to enhancing hospital care for those with autism and intellectual and developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To enhance hospital care for those with autism and intellectual and developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-06 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2253 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5441
S1469 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S1469 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H219.pdf |